Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 03/27/2021 at 16:43:03 (UTC).

Ferall Walker Plaintiff vs. Edison Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 Ferall Walker Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Edison Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lopane, Nicholas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6134

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lopane, Nicholas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walker, Ferall

Defendant

Edison Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rosenbaum, Daniel

Attorney at HL LAW GROUP P.A.

2601 East Oakland Park Boulevard, Ste. 503

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33306

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

3/25/2021 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

3/24/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

3/24/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Filing

3/24/2021 - Notice of Filing

Request for Admissions

3/24/2021 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Interrogatories

3/24/2021 - Notice of Interrogatories

Request for Production of Documents

3/24/2021 - Request for Production of Documents

eSummons Issuance

3/24/2021 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR DAMAGES; Party: Plaintiff Walker, Ferall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Party: Plaintiff Walker, Ferall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Plaintiff Walker, Ferall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Interrogatories; Party: Plaintiff Walker, Ferall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production of Documents; Party: Plaintiff Walker, Ferall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Edison Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBAUM, DANIEL