This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 03/06/2021 at 18:07:45 (UTC).

Federal National Mortgage Association Plaintiff vs. Ann Marie D Girard, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 12/28/2015 Federal National Mortgage Association Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Ann Marie D Girard, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2765

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Federal National Mortgage Association

Defendants

Florida Housing Finance Corporation

Maceachern, Matthew

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Girard, Ann Marie D

Stonegate Bank

City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida

Ft Lauderdale Florida, City of

Community Bank of Broward

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Swartz, Sean Matthew

Attorney at Robertson, Anschutz, Schneid, Crane & Partners, PLLC

6409 Congress Ave., Suite 100

Boca Raton, FL 33487-2853

Defendant Attorneys

Saoud, Aaron

Attorney at Saoud Law & Associates, P.A.

419 W. Platt Street

Tampa, FL 33606

Treusch, Andy

Attorney at TREUSCH LAW GROUP PA

1535 Rambling Oaks Ln

Deland, FL 32720-3640

Montoya, Rhonda L.

Attorney at CITY OF FORT LAUDERDALE

100 N Andrews Ave

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

Motion for Writ of Possession

2/17/2017 - Motion for Writ of Possession

Motion for Writ of Possession

2/13/2017 - Motion for Writ of Possession

Certificate of Title

12/28/2016 - Certificate of Title

Certificate of Sale

12/14/2016 - Certificate of Sale

Bid Sheet

12/14/2016 - Bid Sheet

Proof of Publication

12/5/2016 - Proof of Publication

Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

11/16/2016 - Notice of Sale - Issued by Attorney

Notice of Filing

11/9/2016 - Notice of Filing

Report

11/9/2016 - Report

Final Disposition Form

11/9/2016 - Final Disposition Form

Notice of Filing

11/9/2016 - Notice of Filing

Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

11/8/2016 - Order Granting Motion to Withdraw

Motion to Withdraw

11/4/2016 - Motion to Withdraw

Exhibit List

10/25/2016 - Exhibit List

Notice of Filing

10/21/2016 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Appearance

10/10/2016 - Notice of Appearance

Notice

9/30/2016 - Notice

Certificate of Service

7/13/2016 - Certificate of Service

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2017
  • DispositionDisposed by Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Writ of Possession

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketRe-open Fee; Payor: CHRISTOPHER CHARLES LINDHARDT ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A023692; Amount: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketRe-open Fee; Payor: TEODORA SIDEROVA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A021340; Amount: $50.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Writ of Possession; Party: Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Title

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Sale

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBid Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • HearingForeclosure Sale; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): Not Applicable, ,; Location: On-line @ www.broward.realforeclose.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • DocketForeclosure Sale Fee; Payor: DAVID SCHNEID ; Userid: CTS- ; Receipt: 20161RA1A012506; Amount: $70.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Certification; Party: Plaintiff Federal National Mortgage Association

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: ANN MARIE D GIRARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: MATTHEW MACEACHERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: STONEGATE BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANN MARIE D GIRARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATTHEW MACEACHERN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ISSUED ON: CITY OF FORT LAUDERDALE, FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less