This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:28:19 (UTC).

Fatima Attkisson, et al Plaintiff vs. Sheila Rockley, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Fatima Attkisson, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Sheila Rockley, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5704

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Attkisson, Fatima

Attkisson, Mel

Defendants

Rockley, Sheila

Sanchez, Tony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alvarez, Tamatha S., ESQ.

Attorney at Martin, Lister & Alvarez, PLC

1655 N. Commerce Parkway, Suite 102

Weston, FL 33326

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Sanchez, Tony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Rockley, Sheila

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR DAMAGES; Party: Plaintiff Attkisson, Fatima; Party: Plaintiff Attkisson, Mel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less