This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 14:24:18 (UTC).

Evelyn Destin, et al Plaintiff vs. 2017-1 IH Borrower, L.P. Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Evelyn Destin, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against 2017-1 IH Borrower, L P Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haury, William W., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5750

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haury, William W., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Destin, Josetta

Destin, Evelyn

Defendant

2017-1 IH Borrower, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chalik, Debi F

Attorney at Chalik & Chalik, P.A

10063 N.W 1St Court

Plantation, FL 33324-0000

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

9/23/2020 - Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Request for Production

9/23/2020 - Request for Production

Request for Admissions

9/23/2020 - Request for Admissions

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/4/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; 2017-1 IH BORROWER L.P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Propounding Interrogatories; DEFENDANT, 2017-1 IH BORROWER L.P; Party: Plaintiff Destin, Evelyn; Party: Plaintiff Destin, Josetta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Destin, Evelyn; Party: Plaintiff Destin, Josetta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENDANT; Party: Plaintiff Destin, Evelyn; Party: Plaintiff Destin, Josetta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; None

    Read MoreRead Less