This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 19:36:08 (UTC).

Encantada At Pembroke Pines Community Assoc Inc Plaintiff vs. Wayne Washington Ennis, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 Encantada At Pembroke Pines Community Assoc Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Wayne Washington Ennis, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1908

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Encantada At Pembroke Pines Community Assoc Inc

Defendants

Unknown Tenant #2

Ennis, Karen Loy

Unknown Tenant #1

Ennis, Wayne Washington

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meloni, Edoardo

Attorney at The Meloni Law Firm

1701 Ne 164 Street, Suite 303

N Miami Beach, FL 33162

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Unserved

2/20/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Served

2/20/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved

2/20/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Served

2/20/2018 - Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance

2/12/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/12/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/12/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

2/12/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

2/9/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/9/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/9/2018 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

4/3/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Comment (And Discharge Of Lis Pendens ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114989411

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant Unknown Tenant #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; February 13, 2018; Party: Defendant Ennis, Karen Loy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant Unknown Tenant #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/13/18; Party: Defendant Ennis, Wayne Washington

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: EDOARDO MELONI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021389; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Ennis, Wayne Washington

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Ennis, Karen Loy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unknown Tenant #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Unknown Tenant #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: EDOARDO MELONI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021641; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: EDOARDO MELONI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021641; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: EDOARDO MELONI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021641; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: EDOARDO MELONI ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A021641; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Fld & Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meloni, Edoardo