This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/25/2020 at 17:39:05 (UTC).

Emerald Place Apartments LLC Plaintiff vs. Melvin Taylor, Jr., et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 Emerald Place Apartments LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Melvin Taylor, Jr , Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Betsy. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2047

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Betsy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Emerald Place Apartments LLC

Defendants

Parashina, Elena

Taylor, Melvin, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowenhaupt, Kenneth James, ESQ.

Attorney at Law Offices of Lowenhaupt Sawyers and Spinale

7765 Sw 87Th Avenue, Suite 201

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Motion for Default & Default

2/13/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Jgmt

2/13/2020 - Motion for Default Jgmt

Non-Military Affidavit

2/13/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Summons Served-Posted

2/4/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Summons Served-Posted

2/4/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Certificate of Mailing

1/30/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Civil Cover Sheet

1/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

1/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/24/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Default Judgment for Eviction

2/20/2020 - Default Judgment for Eviction

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to BSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Judgment for Eviction; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116365896

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Party: Defendant Taylor, Melvin, Jr.; Party: Defendant Parashina, Elena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/31/2020; Party: Defendant Parashina, Elena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; 1/31/2020; Party: Defendant Taylor, Melvin, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; (BOTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Parashina, Elena

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less