This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 03:23:13 (UTC).

Elicia Smith Plaintiff vs. Esurance Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Elicia Smith Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Esurance Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Carol-Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5697

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Carol-Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith, Elicia

Defendant

Esurance Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boettcher, Ian

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

8151 Peters Road, Suite 4000

Plantation, FL 33324-1311

 

Court Documents

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/24/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

Interrogatories & Notice of Service

9/23/2020 - Interrogatories & Notice of Service

Request for Production

9/23/2020 - Request for Production

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; none

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ESURANCE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories & Notice of Service; TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less