This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 11/19/2020 at 22:15:28 (UTC).

Elan Holdings LLC Plaintiff vs. Thomas Kennedy Broward County Tax Collector, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 Elan Holdings LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Thomas Kennedy Broward County Tax Collector, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1227

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elan Holdings LLC

Defendants

Thomas Kennedy Broward County Tax Collector

Lori Parrish, Broward Cty Property Tax Appraiser

Leon M Biegalski, Executive Director of Fl Dept of Revenue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edison, Eric Corey

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dismissal

1/4/2018 - Notice of Dismissal

Directions to Clerk-Disposed

9/18/2018 - Directions to Clerk-Disposed

Petition (eFiled)

11/18/2016 - Petition (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

11/18/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/18/2016 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

11/18/2016 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

11/18/2016 - Civil Cover Sheet

Order Setting Case Management Conference

11/6/2017 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

9/17/2018 - Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2018
View Court Documents

DispositionDirections to Clerk-Disposed; Comment (NOTICE OF DISMISSAL was filed January 4, 2018 ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115341680

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCircuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2018
View Court Documents

DispositionNotice of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 114812645

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2018

DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2017
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Setting Case Management Conference; 01-05-18 @ 9 am rm 16165

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2016

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: ERIC C. EDISON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A164301; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2016

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIC C. EDISON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A164301; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2016

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIC C. EDISON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A164301; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2016

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ERIC C. EDISON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20161FA1A164301; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2016
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2016
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Lori Parrish, Broward Cty Property Tax Appraiser

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2016
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Thomas Kennedy Broward County Tax Collector

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2016
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Leon M Biegalski, Executive Director of Fl Dept of Revenue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2016
View Court Documents

DocketPetition (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Elan Holdings LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less