This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/03/2020 at 15:49:43 (UTC).

Elaine M Lynes, et al Plaintiff vs. Phillip Morris USA Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 Elaine M Lynes, Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Phillip Morris USA Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4581

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Seltzer, H. Jean

Lynes, Elaine M

Defendants

BROOK GROUP HOLDING, INC.

VECTOR GROUP LTD INC.

AMERICAN TOBACCO COMPANY

Phillip Morris USA Inc

R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

BROOK GROUP LTD, INC.

LORILLARD TOBACCO COMPANY

LIGGETT GROUP, LLC

LIGETT GROUP INC.

BROWN & WILLIAMSON TOBACCO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Gonzalez, Giselle

Attorney at KASOWITZ BENSON TORRES LLP

1441 Brickell Avenue, Ste 1420

Miami, FL 33131-0000

Cruz-Alvarez, Frank

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon Llp

201 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 2400

Miami, FL 33131-4332

Reid, Benjamin

Attorney at Carlton Fields

100 Se 2Nd St, Suite 4200

Miami, FL 33131

Keehfus, Jason E

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

Hohnbaum, Cory

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

300 South Tryon Street, Suite 1700

Charlotte, NC 28202

Evans, Austin A

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

Pedrosa, Eliot

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

333 Se 2Nd Ave. Ste. 4400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation

3/26/2018 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Appearance

3/12/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Hearing

3/10/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Notice for/of Trial

3/8/2018 - Notice for/of Trial

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

1/12/2018 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Hearing

1/5/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Filing

1/5/2018 - Notice of Filing

Answer to Amended Complaint

9/5/2017 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Response to Request for Admissions

8/4/2017 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion to Consolidate

8/4/2017 - Motion to Consolidate

Motion to Consolidate

8/4/2017 - Motion to Consolidate

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

8/4/2017 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Case Summary

8/4/2017 - Case Summary

Letter/Answer

8/4/2017 - Letter/Answer

Request for Admissions

8/4/2017 - Request for Admissions

Receipt for Transfer

8/4/2017 - Receipt for Transfer

Request for Admissions

8/4/2017 - Request for Admissions

Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice

9/18/2018 - Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionVoluntary Dismissal With Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 3 Pages; Instrument Number: 115352788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Request for Notices and Designation of Email Addresses of Cory Hohnbaum (FBN: 0110049), Jason E. Keefus (FBN: 0076941), Austin A. Evans (FBN: 107692,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice for/of Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; TOBACCO COMPANY TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED WRONGFUL DEATH DAMAGES COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY; Party: Defendant R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Amended Complaint; PHILIP MORRIS USA INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED WRONGFUL DEATH DAMAGES COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint; AMENDED WRONGFUL DEATH DAMAGES COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY; Party: Plaintiff Lynes, Elaine M; Party: Plaintiff Seltzer, H. Jean

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Motion; FOR DROPPING DEFENDANTS LIGGETT GROUP LLC AND VECTOR GROUP LTD., ONLY WITH PREJUDICE; Party: Plaintiff Lynes, Elaine M; Party: Defendant VECTOR GROUP LTD INC.; Party: Defendant LIGGETT GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions; Party: Defendant Phillip Morris USA Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate; Party: Plaintiff Seltzer, H. Jean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Consolidate; Party: Plaintiff Lynes, Elaine M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; (AMENDED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Summary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter/Answer; FROM MIAMI-DADE CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Defendant R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt for Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; Party: Defendant R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKS GROUP LLC DOING BUSINESS AS JOHNS PASS GRILLE is a litigant

Latest cases where BROOKE GROUP HOLDING INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Brown & Williamson Tobacco Corporation as Successor-by-Merger to The American Tobacco Company is a litigant