This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/24/2020 at 17:19:24 (UTC).

EAYC Investments LLC Plaintiff vs. Arik Trisker Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 EAYC Investments LLC Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Arik Trisker Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hilal, Jennifer Wigand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1991

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hilal, Jennifer Wigand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAYC Investments LLC

Defendant

Trisker, Arik

 

Court Documents

Order Deferring

2/17/2020 - Order Deferring

Summons Returned Served

2/11/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Notice of Filing

2/11/2020 - Notice of Filing

Non-Military Affidavit

2/11/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default & Default

2/11/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

2/11/2020 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Civil Cover Sheet

1/24/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/24/2020 - Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Deferring; ON MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPleadings Sent Up To Judge; Judgment and Writ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Non-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued to Process Server

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less