This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 21:33:47 (UTC).

DryMaxpro Restoration of Florida Plaintiff vs. Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 DryMaxpro Restoration of Florida Plaintiff filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2010

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DryMaxpro Restoration of Florida

Silva, Sandra

Silva, Gustavo

Defendant

Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mineo, Peter, Jr.

Attorney at The Mineo Salcedo Law Firm PA

5600 Davie Road

Davie, FL 33314

Defendant Attorney

Sperber, M.Andrew, ESQ.

Attorney at Counsel for Hertage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

1571 Sawgrass Corporate Parkway,, Suite 400

Sunrise, FL 33323

 

Court Documents

Stipulation for Dismissal

4/9/2018 - Stipulation for Dismissal

Notice of Appearance

3/12/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

3/12/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Amended Complaint

2/20/2018 - Amended Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogs

2/13/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

2/13/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Taking Deposition

2/13/2018 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Complaint (eFiled)

2/13/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

2/13/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Request to Produce

2/13/2018 - Request to Produce

eSummons Issuance

2/13/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Final Order of Dismissal

4/11/2018 - Final Order of Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal; Comment (WITH PREJUDICE ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115004636

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for Dismissal; Party: Plaintiff DryMaxpro Restoration of Florida; Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Party: Plaintiff DryMaxpro Restoration of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Plaintiff DryMaxpro Restoration of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; Party: Plaintiff DryMaxpro Restoration of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Party: Plaintiff DryMaxpro Restoration of Florida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Heritage Property and Casualty Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A022596; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: PETER J. MINEO ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A022596; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less