This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 22:41:39 (UTC).

Discover Bank Plaintiff vs. Valarie Tarmon Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Discover Bank Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Valarie Tarmon Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2077

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Tarmon, Valarie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavrar, Flynn

Attorney at RAS LaVrar LLC

Po Box 19039

Plantation, FL 33317

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

11/13/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

10/31/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Memo

9/24/2018 - Memo

Motion for Default

9/17/2018 - Motion for Default

Default

9/17/2018 - Default

Motion for Default Final Judgment

9/17/2018 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Certificate

9/17/2018 - Certificate

Non-Military Affidavit

9/17/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Filing

9/17/2018 - Notice of Filing

Summons Returned Served

8/9/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Notice

7/2/2018 - Notice

Civil Cover Sheet

2/16/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

2/16/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/16/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice

2/16/2018 - Notice

eSummons Issuance

2/16/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Default Final Judgment

11/30/2018 - Default Final Judgment

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketCert Copy Jgmt Issued; to recording

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketCertified Copy Fee; Payor: RAS LAVRAR LAW OFFICES ; Userid: CTS-cbrown ; Receipt: 20193YF3C000113; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115476754

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; December 18,2018 at 10:30 A.M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemo; sent by Judge Levine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default; Party: Plaintiff Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT; Party: Plaintiff Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 08-06-18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF FAILURE TO SERVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A024551; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A024551; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less