This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 22:57:12 (UTC).

Discover Bank Plaintiff vs. Simmie Benjamin Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Discover Bank Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Simmie Benjamin Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2088

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Benjamin, Simmie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavrar, Flynn

Attorney at RAS LaVrar LLC

Po Box 19039

Plantation, FL 33317

 

Court Documents

Affidavit of Non-Compliance

3/26/2019 - Affidavit of Non-Compliance

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/23/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Stipulation for-of Settlement

3/21/2018 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

Summons Returned Served

3/15/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/16/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/16/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice

2/16/2018 - Notice

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/16/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Final Judgment

4/15/2019 - Final Judgment

Order Approving Settlement

3/27/2018 - Order Approving Settlement

Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

3/23/2018 - Stipulation & Order Approving Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCertified Copy Fee; Payor: RAS LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-acastillo ; Receipt: 20193YF3F000021; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCertified Copy Issued; TO RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment; Comment (In Favor of Plaintiff ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115742468

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Compliance; SETTLEMENT DEFAULT AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionStipulation & Order Approving Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for-of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 03/08/2018; Party: Defendant Benjamin, Simmie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A024632; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A024632; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less