This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 22:33:20 (UTC).

Discover Bank Plaintiff vs. Scott C Russell Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Discover Bank Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Scott C Russell Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2066

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Russell, Scott C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavrar, Flynn

Attorney at RAS LaVrar LLC

Po Box 19039

Plantation, FL 33317

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

7/19/2019 - Request to Produce

Non-Military Affidavit

8/23/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default Final Judgment

8/23/2018 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Certificate

8/23/2018 - Certificate

Default

8/23/2018 - Default

Motion for Default

8/23/2018 - Motion for Default

Notice of Filing

8/23/2018 - Notice of Filing

Summons Returned Served

3/30/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

2/16/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

2/16/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/16/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice

2/16/2018 - Notice

eSummons Issuance

2/16/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Default Final Judgment

8/28/2018 - Default Final Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketCertified Copy Fee; Payor: RAS LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-crodriguez ; Receipt: 20183YF3K000167; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketCertified Copy; of default final jgmt sent to recording divsion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115291454

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Defendant Russell, Scott C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; of taxable costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault; Party: Defendant Russell, Scott C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Supporting Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 21st day of March, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; of designation of lead attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Russell, Scott C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A024658; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A024658; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LaVrar, Flynn, ESQ.