This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/05/2020 at 00:50:52 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK Plaintiff vs. OTIS W TRACEY Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 DISCOVER BANK Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OTIS W TRACEY Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1228

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

TRACEY, OTIS W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jovanovich, Zoran D

Attorney at Attn: Zwicker & Associates, P.C.

700 W Hillsboro Blvd, Bldg 2 Ste#201

Deerfield Beach, FL 33441-1612

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Form

4/17/2019 - Final Disposition Form

Stipulation for-of Settlement

12/14/2018 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

Alias Summons Returned Served

10/25/2018 - Alias Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance - Alias

10/3/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Alias

Order Granting Motion

9/26/2018 - Order Granting Motion

Motion for Extension of Time

9/20/2018 - Motion for Extension of Time

Summons Returned Unserved

3/26/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

eSummons Issuance

2/1/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

2/1/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

2/1/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

4/17/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

Order Approving Settlement

12/18/2018 - Order Approving Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115749481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement; Comment (& FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115537716

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for-of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons Returned Served; 10/13/18; Party: Defendant TRACEY, OTIS W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ZORAN D JOVANOVICH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A134492; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion; PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO OBTAIN SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO OBTAIN SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant TRACEY, OTIS W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ZORAN D JOVANOVICH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A016465; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ZORAN D JOVANOVICH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A016465; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jovanovich, Zoran David