This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/10/2020 at 17:48:44 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Plaintiff vs. Barbara Jean Parrish, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/14/2018 Deutsche Bank National Trust Company Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Barbara Jean Parrish, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4412

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

Defendants

Arrow Financial Services LLC

Parrish, Barbara Jean

Bank of America National Association

Crumbaker, Jean E

Parrish, Barbara

NCNB National Bank Of Florida

Crumbaker, David P

Nationsbank National Association

Washington Mutual Bank Credit Account

Parrish, Barbara J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jagendorf, Ian D

Attorney at Van Ness Law Firm, PLC

1239 E. Newport Center Drive, Suite 110

Deerfield Beach, FL 33442

 

Court Documents

Final Disposition Form

8/16/2018 - Final Disposition Form

Summons Returned Served

8/15/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

8/15/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

8/15/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

8/15/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

8/15/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

8/15/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved

8/15/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved

Certificate

6/14/2018 - Certificate

Value Claim Form

6/14/2018 - Value Claim Form

eSummons Issuance

6/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/14/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

8/16/2018 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Comment (AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115277881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Disposition Form; Dismissed Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 7/23/2018; Party: Defendant Parrish, Barbara Jean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 8/6/2018; Party: Defendant Crumbaker, Jean E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 8/7/2018; Party: Defendant Arrow Financial Services LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 7/20/2018; Party: Defendant Parrish, Barbara Jean

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 7/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 7/24/2018; Party: Defendant Crumbaker, David P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA JEAN PARRISH A/K/A BARBARA PARRISH A/K/A BARBARA J. PARRISH

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); for Foreclosure of Mortgage; Party: Plaintiff Deutsche Bank National Trust Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTE 702.015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Barbara Jean Parrish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Spouse of Barbara Jean Parrish

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; David P Crumbaker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Jean E Crumbaker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Bank of America National Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Arrow Financial Services LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Tenants in Possession of Subject Property

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationsbank (na) is a litigant

Latest cases where Ncnb National Bank Of Fl is a litigant

Latest cases where ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Washington Mutual Bank is a litigant