This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 03:18:53 (UTC).

Dawn Mackenzie Plaintiff vs. Emanuel Calzadilla, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 Dawn Mackenzie Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Emanuel Calzadilla, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Perlman, Sandra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5593

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Perlman, Sandra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mackenzie, Dawn

Defendants

Calzadilla, Emanuel

Calzadilla, Isabella

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Egleston, Scott D

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SCOTTD. EGLESTON, PA

152 Ne 167Th St, Suite #300

Miami, FL 33162

 

Court Documents

Non-Military Affidavit

9/24/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Non-Military Affidavit

9/24/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

eSummons Issuance

9/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

9/24/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

9/23/2020 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Civil Cover Sheet

9/22/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

9/22/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Emanuel Calzadilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Isabella Calzadilla

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR EJECTMENT FROM REAl ESTATE; Party: Plaintiff Mackenzie, Dawn

    Read MoreRead Less