This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 04/18/2021 at 16:26:59 (UTC).

Darquita Johnson Plaintiff vs. HCFS Health Care Fin Serv LLC. Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Darquita Johnson Plaintiff filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HCFS Health Care Fin Serv LLC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7578

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnson, Darquita

Defendants

HCFS Health Care Fin Serv LLC.

Team Helath, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Georges-Pierre, Anthony Maximillien

Attorney at Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC

44 West Flagler Street, Suite 2200

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

4/15/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

4/14/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

4/14/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; HCFS HEALTH CARE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Johnson, Darquita

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HCFS Health Care Financial Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Team Health is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY M GEORGES-PIERRE, ESQ