This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/02/2020 at 01:01:10 (UTC).

Cypress Head Club Inc Plaintiff vs. Donald Caputo, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 Cypress Head Club Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Donald Caputo, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lopane, Nicholas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3229

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lopane, Nicholas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cypress Head Club Inc

Defendants

Caputo, Donald

SunTrust Bank

Caputo, Roberta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Arcia, John Paul

Cuneo, Frank P

 

Court Documents

Letter Returned From Post Office

5/7/2018 - Letter Returned From Post Office

Good Faith Form

3/15/2018 - Good Faith Form

Order Disbursing Funds

3/15/2018 - Order Disbursing Funds

Notice of Filing

3/14/2018 - Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing Affidavit

2/5/2018 - Notice of Filing Affidavit

Notice of Hearing

2/1/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Letter Returned From Post Office

1/11/2018 - Letter Returned From Post Office

Notice of Filing

1/4/2018 - Notice of Filing

Motion for Disbursement

1/4/2018 - Motion for Disbursement

Certificate of Disbursements

12/19/2017 - Certificate of Disbursements

Certificate of Title

12/19/2017 - Certificate of Title

Owner's Claim for Mortgage Foreclosure Surplus

12/13/2017 - Owner's Claim for Mortgage Foreclosure Surplus

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

12/13/2017 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Notice of Appearance

12/13/2017 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

12/11/2017 - Notice of Appearance

Certificate of Sale

12/7/2017 - Certificate of Sale

Bid Sheet

12/7/2017 - Bid Sheet

Proof of Publication

11/22/2017 - Proof of Publication

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketCheck Paid; to Suntrust Bank per ord ($23,821.40); to John Paul Arcia PA Tr Acct ($547.66) mailed & Brenda Forman ($30.00) svc chg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Returned From Post Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGood Faith Form; SUNTRUST BANKS'S MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF SURPLUS FUND FROM FORECLOSURE SALE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Disbursing Funds; GRANTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter Returned From Post Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS; Party: Defendant SunTrust Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Disbursement; Party: Defendant SunTrust Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ASHLEY R TULLOCH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A097465; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ASHLEY R TULLOCH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A097465; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ASHLEY R TULLOCH ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A097465; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); For Foreclosure; Party: Plaintiff Cypress Head Club Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Defendant, Donald Caputo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Defendant, Roberta Caputo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; To Unknown Tenant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Defendant, SunsTrust Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less