This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 11/01/2022 at 13:52:52 (UTC).

C.V.P. COMMUNITY CENTER, INC., et al Plaintiff vs. NELLY JOSEFINA RODRIGUEZ, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 C filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against P COMMUNITY CENTER, INC , Plaintiff. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Mollica, Kim Theresa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4741

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Mollica, Kim Theresa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C.V.P. COMMUNITY CENTER, INC.

PINES MASTER MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ, NELLY JOSEFINA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NELLY JOSEFINA RODRIGUEZ

TRUIST BANK AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BAN

CAMBRIDGE AT CENTURY VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gottlieb, Brian D

3333 W. Commercial Blvd, Suite 200B

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorney

Mulrey, Tara Nicole

Attorney at Straley Otto PA

2699 Stirling Road Suite C-207

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312-6541

 

Court Documents

Notice of Dropping Party(S)

8/9/2022 - Notice of Dropping Party(S)

eSummons Issuance

7/29/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/29/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/29/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/29/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

7/29/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Lis Pendens

7/29/2022 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Complaint (eFiled)

7/29/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/29/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Returned Served

8/3/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved

8/5/2022 - Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Served

8/10/2022 - Summons Returned Served

Motion for Default & Default

8/24/2022 - Motion for Default & Default

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

8/30/2022 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

8/30/2022 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

9/12/2022 - Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Party: Defendant CAMBRIDGE AT CENTURY VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses; Party: Defendant CAMBRIDGE AT CENTURY VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Party: Defendant TRUIST BANK AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 5th day of August, 2022; Party: Defendant CAMBRIDGE AT CENTURY VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Dropping Party(S); Comment (UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 118330316

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved; Party: Defendant UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 8/3/2022; Party: Defendant TRUIST BANK AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined Streamlined

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $8,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Fld & Rec; Party: Plaintiff C.V.P. COMMUNITY CENTER, INC.; Party: Plaintiff PINES MASTER MANAGEMENT, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant CAMBRIDGE AT CENTURY VILLAGE CONDOMINIUM IV ASSOCI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant RODRIGUEZ, NELLY JOSEFINA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NELLY JOSEFINA RODRIGUEZ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant TRUIST BANK AS SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO SUNTRUST BAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant UNKNOWN TENANT(S) IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.V.P. COMMUNITY CENTER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mulrey, Tara Nicole