This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 04/26/2022 at 16:55:54 (UTC).

Crown Asset Management LLC Plaintiff vs. Lilia Gomez Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 Crown Asset Management LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Lilia Gomez Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Powell, Jackie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7731

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Powell, Jackie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crown Asset Management LLC

Defendant

Gomez, Lilia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mayers, Breanna Nicole Tiffany

887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

Letter From

4/1/2022 - Letter From

Copy

4/1/2022 - Copy

Civil Cover Sheet

4/1/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Certified Copy

4/1/2022 - Certified Copy

Certified Copy

4/1/2022 - Certified Copy

Receipt for Transfer

4/1/2022 - Receipt for Transfer

Motion to Transfer

4/1/2022 - Motion to Transfer

Summons Issued

4/1/2022 - Summons Issued

Administrative Order

4/1/2022 - Administrative Order

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

4/1/2022 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Request

4/1/2022 - Request

Complaint

4/1/2022 - Complaint

Order Extending Time

4/6/2022 - Order Extending Time

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • HearingCredit Card - Pretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 47 Powell, Jackie; Location: Courtroom WW5150

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Extending Time; The Clerk of Court has scheduled the pretrial conference for August 8,2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketComment:; CERT COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER SENT TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketComment:; Certified copy of transfer order and receipt for filing fee mailed to PL Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketComment:; Receipt for file and certified copy of transfer order mailed to Hillsborough County Clerk of Courts

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAdministrative Order; REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt for Transfer; Hillsborough County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy; ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertified Copy; PROGRESS DOCKET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy; ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter From; HILLSBOROUGH CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYERS, BREANNA NICOLE TIFFANY