This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/22/2020 at 13:36:33 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation Plaintiff vs. Julienne Sam, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 Credit Acceptance Corporation Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Julienne Sam, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Di Pietro, Nina W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2842

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Di Pietro, Nina W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendants

Sam, Julienne

Sam, Julie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dragutsky, Jason S

Attorney at Hayt Hayt & Landau, PL

7765 Sw 87Th Ave Ste 101

Miami, FL 33173

 

Court Documents

Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment

2/5/2020 - Motion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment

Affidavit of Costs

10/24/2019 - Affidavit of Costs

Non-Military Affidavit

10/24/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Affidavit

10/24/2019 - Affidavit

Motion for Default & Default

10/24/2019 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Final Judgment

10/24/2019 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Summons Returned Served

2/6/2019 - Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

2/6/2019 - Summons Returned Served

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

1/21/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

1/21/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

1/21/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Default Final Judgment

10/31/2019 - Default Final Judgment

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Continuing Writ of Garnishment; Garnishee: Interstate Hotels & Resorts Inc; Party: Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 116150122

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Costs; Party: Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Party: Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit; Party: Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Credit Acceptance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A014560; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A014560; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A014560; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Sam, Julienne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Sam, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less