This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 04/30/2022 at 16:30:24 (UTC).

Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Edward Francis Huerta Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc Plaintiff filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Edward Francis Huerta Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gundersen, Andrea Ruth. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0923

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gundersen, Andrea Ruth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.

Defendant

Huerta, Edward Francis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kasper, Kathryn I

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco PA

1201 S. Orlando Ave., Ste. 430

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

6/1/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/1/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/1/2021 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/1/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Value Claim Form

6/1/2021 - Value Claim Form

Notice of Lis Pendens

6/1/2021 - Notice of Lis Pendens

Complaint (eFiled)

6/1/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

6/1/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

11/23/2021 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice

Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

6/3/2021 - Search for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO

Answer to Complaint

6/18/2021 - Answer to Complaint

Motion for Enlargement of Time

9/28/2021 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Order Extending Time

9/28/2021 - Order Extending Time

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Out Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 117760664

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DispositionDismissed Before Hearing - Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Extending Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; Party: Plaintiff Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint; Party: Defendant Huerta, Edward Francis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSearch for prior case performed per 2020-4-Civ-UFC-CO; nonr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined Streamlined

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Party: Plaintiff Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Huerta, Edward Francis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Spouse of Edward Francis Huerta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Party in Possession 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Unknown Party in Possession 2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cornerstone Home Lending, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kasper, Kathryn I