This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 02/06/2021 at 17:54:44 (UTC).

Constantin Bujor Plaintiff vs. Lori Parrish, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/02/2015 Constantin Bujor Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Lori Parrish, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Robinson, Michael A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1434

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Robinson, Michael A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bujor, Constantin

Defendants

Kennedy, Thomas

Parrish, Lori

Stranburg, Marshall

as Director of Broward Cty Records, Taxes & Treasury

as Broward County Property Appraiser

as Executive Director of Florida Dept of Revenue

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Urban, Mark S, Jr.

Defendant Attorneys

Mathias, Jerrod E, ESQ.

Schwartzreich, Mila K

Sherman, Richard A

Masterson, Stephen M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Cancellation

10/15/2020 - Notice of Cancellation

Notice of Taking Deposition

10/8/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Response to Motion to Dismiss

10/8/2020 - Response to Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Taking Deposition

10/6/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Hearing

9/15/2020 - Notice of Hearing

Expert Witness List

9/15/2020 - Expert Witness List

Order Setting

9/8/2020 - Order Setting

Motion to Dismiss

9/4/2020 - Motion to Dismiss

Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation

8/31/2020 - Joint Pre-Trial Stipulation

Mediation Report

8/28/2020 - Mediation Report

Notice of Mediation

8/20/2020 - Notice of Mediation

Notice of Mediation

8/17/2020 - Notice of Mediation

Order Resetting

5/18/2020 - Order Resetting

Agreed Order

5/15/2020 - Agreed Order

Joint Motion to Continue

5/13/2020 - Joint Motion to Continue

Joint Motion

3/23/2020 - Joint Motion

Notice of Mediation

3/19/2020 - Notice of Mediation

Order Extending Time

3/19/2020 - Order Extending Time

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/06/2020
View Court Documents

DispositionOrder Granting Motion to Dismiss; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 116854130

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2020

DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Cancellation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition; AMENDED CONSTANTIN BUJOR Friday, October 16, 2020 1:00 pm

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketResponse to Motion to Dismiss

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketExpert Witness List

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Setting

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Dismiss; Party: Defendant Parrish, Lori

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
52 More Docket Entries
11/02/2015

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SHERRI LYNN JOHNSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A157951; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2015

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: SHERRI LYNN JOHNSON ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A157951; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2015
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance - On Amended

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2015
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance - On Amended

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2015
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance - On Amended

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/15/2015
View Court Documents

DocketAmended Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2015
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2015
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Bujor, Constantin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2015

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: CONSTANTIN BUJOR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20151FA1A093698; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/02/2015

DocketNo Summons Issued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less