This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/26/2020 at 12:02:47 (UTC).

Connor Hernandez Riley Petitioner vs. Roxany Ruiz Respondent

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 Connor Hernandez Riley Petitioner filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Roxany Ruiz Respondent. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Miller, Lucy Ramos and Bailey, Dennis D.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3537

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Magistrate

Miller, Lucy Ramos

Judge

Bailey, Dennis D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Riley, Connor Hernandez

Respondent

Ruiz, Roxany

Minor

R, D E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Resnik, Marcy S

Attorney at KAHN & RESNICK, P.L.

1815 Griffin Road, Suite 207

Dania, FL 33004-2252

Geffin, Alan G

Attorney at GPG LAW

1326 Se 3Rd Ave

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33316

Respondent Attorney

Hurtado, Jorge E

Attorney at Law Offices of Jorge E. Hurtado, P.A

1515 University Drive, Suite 221

Coral Springs, FL 33071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketComment:; HRS form 673 with CC FJ to BVS/FL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DispositionFinal Order of Dismissal; Comment (ESTABLISHING PATERNITY ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 116346127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion to Strike; THE SPECIFIC REFERENCE CONTAINED IN PARAGRAPH 13 OF PETITION; FATHER TO AMEND PETITION WITHIN 20 DAYS FROM THIS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition; TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF; Party: Petitioner Riley, Connor Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Petition; Party: Respondent Ruiz, Roxany

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketMotion to Strike; Party: Respondent Ruiz, Roxany

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketOrder Extending Time; TO RESPOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; TO RESPOND; Party: Respondent Ruiz, Roxany

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 12th day of December, 2019; Party: Respondent Ruiz, Roxany

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2019-17-UFC; /NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W_2017-19-UFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketFamily Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketPetition (eFiled); TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF; Party: Petitioner Riley, Connor Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketMotion; URGENT MOTION FOR TEMPORARY TIMESHARING; Party: Petitioner Riley, Connor Hernandez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Roxany Ruiz

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORGE HURTADO