This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/04/2020 at 13:47:25 (UTC).

Clovis Boveto Plaintiff vs. Sports Authority Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 Clovis Boveto Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Sports Authority Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5071

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boveto, Clovis

Defendants

Weingarten Realty Management Company

TJX Companies Inc

Weingarten Realty Investors

Sports Authority Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gelety, Michael Timothy

Attorney at Friedland & Associates

707 Ne 3Rd Ave Ste 201

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Friedland, Lee

707 Ne 3Rd Ave, Ste 201

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Defendant Attorneys

Dareneau, Nicholas P

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith LLP

401 E Jackson St, Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602-5874

Rine, John A

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

401 East Jackson Street, Suite 3400

Tampa, FL 33602

Carney, Michael J

Attorney at Kubicki Draper

1 East Broward Boulevard, Wells Fargo Tower - Suite 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-0000

 

Court Documents

Subpoena Returned Served

6/1/2020 - Subpoena Returned Served

Notice of Mediation

5/29/2020 - Notice of Mediation

Confirmation of Selection for Mediators

5/28/2020 - Confirmation of Selection for Mediators

Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

5/20/2020 - Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

5/18/2020 - Re-Notice of Taking Deposition

Order

5/18/2020 - Order

Response to Motion

5/15/2020 - Response to Motion

Notice of Taking Deposition

5/15/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Taking Deposition

5/15/2020 - Notice of Taking Deposition

Notice of Service of Interrogs

10/23/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service of Interrogs

10/23/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service of Interrogs

10/23/2018 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request to Produce

10/23/2018 - Request to Produce

Request to Produce

10/23/2018 - Request to Produce

Request to Produce

10/23/2018 - Request to Produce

eSummons Issuance

10/23/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

10/23/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

10/23/2018 - eSummons Issuance

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubpoena Returned Served; SERVED ON PETE WHALEN ON MAY 23, 2020 AT 2:39 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConfirmation of Selection for Mediators

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-Notice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-Notice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; on Df's Mot for Summary Judgment/Deferred

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Motion; PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TJX COMPANIES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment; Party: Defendant Weingarten Realty Investors

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Boveto, Clovis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT THE SPORTS AUTHORITY INC; Party: Plaintiff Boveto, Clovis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT TJX COMPAINES, INC; Party: Plaintiff Boveto, Clovis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT WEINGARTEN REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Party: Plaintiff Boveto, Clovis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT THE SPORTS AUTHORITY, INC; Party: Plaintiff Boveto, Clovis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT TJX COMPANIES, INC; Party: Plaintiff Boveto, Clovis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; TO DEFENDANT WEINGARTEN REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY; Party: Plaintiff Boveto, Clovis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; THE SPORTS AUTHORITY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; TJX COMPANIES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; WEINGARTEN REALTY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEINGARTEN REALTY MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, is a litigant

Latest cases where TSA STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEINGARTEN REALTY INVESTORS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where The TJX Companies, Inc. d/b/a T.J.Maxx is a litigant