This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 08/19/2021 at 13:21:25 (UTC).

City of Plantation Plaintiff vs. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 City of Plantation Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5882

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of Plantation

Posey, Michael

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aronin, Barry

Attorney at LaBovick Law Group

950 S Pine Islandl Rd, Suite A- 150

Plantation, FL 33324-3918

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

7/21/2021 - eSummons Issuance

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

7/21/2021 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

7/21/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

8/9/2021 - Notice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service on Insurance Comm-Returned Served; 07/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPer AO 2020-85-CO-Rules of Civil Procedure Invoked (No PTH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Plantation is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Aronin, Barry