This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/28/2020 at 14:25:50 (UTC).

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION Plaintiff vs. JD RESTORATION, INC. Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against JD RESTORATION, INC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5752

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

JD RESTORATION, INC.

BURGOS, MARTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butz, Kyle, ESQ.

420 S Dixie Hwy Fl 3

Coral Gables, FL 33146-2227

Defendant Attorney

Carter, Mathew

Attorney at Law Offices of Matthew Carter, PA

350 South Miami Avenue, Suite A

Miami, FL 33130

 

Court Documents

Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of:

9/25/2020 - Pre-billed Appellant pending payment of:

Acknowledgment

9/24/2020 - Acknowledgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPre-billed Appellant pending payment of:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment; COCE18-25598

    Read MoreRead Less