This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 04/22/2020 at 19:14:46 (UTC).

Chiromed Injury Center PA Plaintiff vs. Progressive Select Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 Chiromed Injury Center PA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Progressive Select Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miller, Terri-Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4489

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miller, Terri-Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chiromed Injury Center PA

De Castro Melo, Cleber

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thompson, Nicholas Richard

Attorney at Reifkind, Thompson & Rudzinski LLP

189 South Orange Avenue, Suite 840

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

Request for Admissions

4/14/2020 - Request for Admissions

Request for Production

4/14/2020 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/14/2020 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Supplemental Interrogatories

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Interrogatories

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Interrogatories

Supplemental Request to Produce

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Supplemental Request to Produce

4/14/2020 - Supplemental Request to Produce

Civil Cover Sheet

4/1/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

4/1/2020 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

4/1/2020 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2020
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 62 Miller, Terri-Ann; Location: South Courtroom 220

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSupplemental Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHRIOMED INJURY CENTER PA is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thompson, Nicholas Richard