This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 15:07:49 (UTC).

Chiro Medical Pain Relief Center Inc Plaintiff vs. Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/05/2019 Chiro Medical Pain Relief Center Inc Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DeLuca, Steven P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2749

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DeLuca, Steven P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Chiro Medical Pain Relief Center Inc

Salazar, Luisa

Defendant

Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phillips, Jonathan

Attorney at Florida Litigators PLLC

319 Clematis St, Suite 310

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant Attorney

Barber, Cecilia M

Attorney at Progressive PIP House Counsel

3230 W Commercial Blvd, Ste 400

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

1/29/2020 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Change of Address

9/13/2019 - Notice of Change of Address

Response to Request for Admissions

6/28/2019 - Response to Request for Admissions

Motion for Extension of Time

6/24/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Waiver of Appearance At Pretrial

5/31/2019 - Waiver of Appearance At Pretrial

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

5/31/2019 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion for Extension of Time

5/24/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Resetting Pretrial

5/1/2019 - Notice of Resetting Pretrial

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/30/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request to Produce

4/30/2019 - Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

4/30/2019 - Request for Admissions

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

4/23/2019 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request to Produce

4/23/2019 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

4/23/2019 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Motion for Extension of Time

4/18/2019 - Motion for Extension of Time

Notice of Appearance

4/18/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

4/16/2019 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Summons Returned Served

4/11/2019 - Summons Returned Served

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel; DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Party: Plaintiff Chiro Medical Pain Relief Center Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address; and designation of email address for service; Party: Plaintiff Chiro Medical Pain Relief Center Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY; Party: Defendant Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 73 DeLuca, Steven P.; Location: North Courtroom 2; CANCELED: Per Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWaiver of Appearance At Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS; Party: Plaintiff Chiro Medical Pain Relief Center Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Resetting Pretrial; 6/4/2019 at 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; Party: Defendant Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Extension of Time; TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Party: Defendant Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • HearingPIP Pre-trial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:01 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 73 DeLuca, Steven P.; Location: North Courtroom 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference; Defendant no show, reset pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 2/14/19 - NO SUMMONS ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: JENNA HOPE LEVY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A020606; Amount: $55.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: JENNA HOPE LEVY ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A020606; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chiro Medical Pain Relief Center Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barber, Cecilia M