This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/27/2020 at 14:39:48 (UTC).

Charmaine Wynter Plaintiff vs. Michael D Wynter Defendant

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Charmaine Wynter Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Michael D Wynter Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Carol-Lisa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5667

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Broward County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Carol-Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wynter, Charmaine

Defendant

Wynter, Michael D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Huges, Joseph s

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph Hughes, PA

515 E. Las Olas Blvd., Suite 120

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

9/25/2020 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

9/23/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

9/23/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

9/23/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 24th day of September, 2020; Party: Defendant Wynter, Michael D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; MICHAEL D. WYNTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less