This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 04/26/2023 at 11:18:17 (UTC).

Charles M Rowars As Trustee Plaintiff vs. Maria C Flor, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Charles M Rowars As Trustee Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Maria C Flor, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0975

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charles M Rowars As Trustee

Pelican Bays

Defendants

Flor, Maria C

Maya Sobe LLC

Salas, Mauricio

Salas, Patricia

United Auto Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hinden, Jon Alexander

Defendant Attorney

Torres, Ricardo, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim

1/6/2023 - Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim

Exhibits

12/12/2022 - Exhibits

Exhibits

12/12/2022 - Exhibits

Exhibits

12/12/2022 - Exhibits

Answer

12/12/2022 - Answer

Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

12/5/2022 - Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

Answer

11/21/2022 - Answer

Third Amended Complaint

10/31/2022 - Third Amended Complaint

Agreed Order

10/28/2022 - Agreed Order

Response to Request to Produce

1/10/2022 - Response to Request to Produce

Motion for Injunction

1/5/2022 - Motion for Injunction

Notice of Hearing

1/5/2022 - Notice of Hearing

Motion for Final Judgment

1/4/2022 - Motion for Final Judgment

Motion to Dismiss

1/3/2022 - Motion to Dismiss

Motion

12/14/2021 - Motion

Request to Produce

12/13/2021 - Request to Produce

Second Amended Complaint

12/13/2021 - Second Amended Complaint

Certified Copy

11/22/2021 - Certified Copy

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Charles M Rowars As Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer; Additional Text; DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline; Additional Text; 10-20-2023 at 9: 30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer; Additional Text; TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Maya Sobe LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Third Amended Complaint; Additional Text; Plaintiff, CHARLES M. ROWARS, as Trustee d/b/a PELICAN BAYS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Agreed Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order Setting Case Management Conference; Additional Text; 12-05-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Injunction; Additional Text; PLAINTIFF'S FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION PROHIBITING DEFENDANTS FROM ENTERING PLAINTIFF'S CONSTRUCTION SITE AREA; Party: Plaintiff Charles M Rowars As Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Hearing; Additional Text; Monday, January 24,2022 10: 15 a.m. to 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Final Judgment; Additional Text; FOR NON RESIDENTIAL EVICTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER; Party: Plaintiff Charles M Rowars As Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion to Dismiss; Additional Text; COUNT VI OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION FOR TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACTUAL RELATIONS; Party: Defendant Flor, Maria C Defendant Maya Sobe LLC Defendant Salas, Mauricio Defendant Salas, Patricia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion; Additional Text; SECOND TO DETERMINE RENT; Party: Defendant Maya Sobe LLC Defendant Salas, Mauricio

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Second Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certified Copy; Additional Text; PROGRESS DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less