This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 07/01/2020 at 19:26:43 (UTC).

Charles M. Rowars as Trustee Plaintiff vs. Fast Forward Import & Logistics LLC, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 Charles M Rowars as Trustee Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Fast Forward Import Logistics LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County South Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Miller, Terri-Ann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7248

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Miller, Terri-Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Charles M. Rowars as Trustee

Pelican Bays

Defendants

Neely, Adrian K

Fast Forward Import & Logistics LLC

Neely, Ricarla Nekia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hinden, Jon Alexander

4430 Sw 64 Avenue

Davie, FL 33314

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

6/12/2020 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

6/12/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/12/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/12/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/12/2020 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

6/12/2020 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

6/12/2020 - Civil Cover Sheet

Verified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act

6/15/2020 - Verified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act

Certificate of Mailing

6/17/2020 - Certificate of Mailing

Summons Served-Posted

6/19/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Summons Served-Posted

6/19/2020 - Summons Served-Posted

Non-Military Affidavit

6/19/2020 - Non-Military Affidavit

Motion for Default & Default

6/23/2020 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Final Judgment of Default

6/25/2020 - Motion for Final Judgment of Default

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Final Judgment of Default; FOR NON-RESIDENTIAL EVICTION [Count I - Only]; Party: Plaintiff Charles M. Rowars as Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; AS TO COUNT I ONLY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; Fast Forward Import & Logistics LLC - 15th day of June, 2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; FAST FORWARD IMPORT & LOGISTICS LLC - 15th day of June 2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerified Statement of Compliance with the CARES Act; Party: Plaintiff Charles M. Rowars as Trustee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $8,639.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; FAST FORWARD IMPORT & LOGISTICS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; FAST FORWARD IMPORT & LOGISTICS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; RICARLA NEKIA NEELY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; ADRIAN K. NEELY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; RICARLA NEKIA NEELY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHARLES M. ROWARS, as Trustee d/b/a PELICAN BAYS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hinden, Jon Alexander