This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 07/08/2021 at 16:13:27 (UTC).

Chantale Pierrelus Plaintiff vs. First Liberty Insurance Corporation Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Chantale Pierrelus Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against First Liberty Insurance Corporation Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Fahnestock, Fabienne E.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3240

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Fahnestock, Fabienne E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pierrelus, Chantale

Defendant

First Liberty Insurance Corporation

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

7/6/2021 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

Civil Cover Sheet

6/30/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

6/30/2021 - Complaint (eFiled)

eSummons Issuance

6/30/2021 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $30,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Party: Plaintiff Pierrelus, Chantale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant First Liberty Insurance Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE FIRST LIBERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant