This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 16:17:42 (UTC).

Cavalry SPV I LLC Plaintiff vs. Alma Hernandez Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/04/2018 Cavalry SPV I LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Alma Hernandez Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1755

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry SPV I LLC

Synchrony Bank/Walmart

Defendant

Hernandez, Alma

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavrar, Flynn

Attorney at RAS LaVrar LLC

Po Box 19039

Plantation, FL 33317

Defendant Attorney

Wieder, Seth, ESQ.

Attorney at The Law Offices Of Shaya Markovic P A

1221 S 21St Ave

Hollywood, FL 33020-6936

 

Court Documents

Motion

9/10/2018 - Motion

Motion for Enlargement of Time

9/10/2018 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

9/10/2018 - Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses

Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim

9/4/2018 - Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim

Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

9/4/2018 - Order Invoking Rules of Civil Procedure

Demand for Jury Trial

9/4/2018 - Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Appearance

9/4/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Alias Summons Returned Served

8/23/2018 - Alias Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

7/30/2018 - Summons Returned Unserved/Unexecuted

eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

7/30/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/13/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/4/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/4/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice

2/4/2018 - Notice

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/4/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

4/22/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

4/15/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice

3/28/2019 - Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115760591

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Comment (Dismiss of counterclaim/Alma Hernandez ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115741901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionVoluntary Dismissal With Prejudice; Comment (COUNTERCLAIM ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 2 Pages; Instrument Number: 115706363

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; FOR COURT-ORDERED MEDIATION; Party: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement of Time; Party: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Affirmative Defenses; Party: Plaintiff Cavalry SPV I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim; Party: Defendant Hernandez, Alma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Alias Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A103173; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 2:00 PM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 DePrimo, Natasha; Location: West Courtroom 260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018712; Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A018712; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less