This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 01/04/2022 at 01:19:35 (UTC).

Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC Plaintiff vs. Georffrey T Ward Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/05/2011 Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Georffrey T Ward Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Fahnestock, Fabienne E.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0425

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Fahnestock, Fabienne E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC

Bank of America/FIA Card Services NA

Cavalry SPV I LLC

Defendant

Ward, Georffrey T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gayle, Tina D

Defendant Attorney

Ditocco, Anthony, III

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Returned Served

4/15/2013 - Writ of Execution Returned Served

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2013
View Court Documents

DocketWrit of Execution Returned Served; 3/6/13; Party: Defendant Ward, Georffrey T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2013

DocketSuggestion of Bankruptcy; Party: Defendant Ward, Georffrey T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2013

DocketNotice of Sheriff Sale; 04/30/13

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2013

DocketWrit of Execution Issued; $24668.13 with 6% legal interest thereon from date of judgment 8/2/11 until paid/mb to atty; Party: Defendant Ward, Georffrey T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2012

DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal of Writ of Garn

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2012

DocketCheck Paid; to John B Kent Esq per answer filed 2/22/12 & amt $100.00 mailed / Wells Fargo Bank NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2012

DocketAnswer of Garnishee; and Demand for Garnishment Deposit / Wells Fargo Bank NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2012

DocketWrit of Garnishment Returned Served; 02/07/2012 garnishee, Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Sucessor in interest to Wachovia Bank, NA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2012

DocketNotice; of Mailing Purs fs 77.041; Party: Plaintiff Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2012

DocketNotice; of Change of atty/J L Kahn fbn 0519200; Party: Plaintiff Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
07/21/2011

DocketAffidavit; of INterest Fees and/or Charges and Aff of Costs; Party: Plaintiff Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2011

DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment; against Df Geoffrey

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2011

DocketNon-Military Affidavit; re:Df Geoffrey

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2011

DocketMotion for Default & Default; against Df Geoffrey

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2011

DocketSummons Returned Served; 05/06/11; Party: Defendant Ward, Georffrey T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2011

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: Gayle, Tina D ; Userid: CTS-dwalters ; Receipt: 20111YE1D003312; Comments: #17590/SIS1/HB TO PS ; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2011

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: Gayle, Tina D ; Userid: CTS-dwalters ; Receipt: 20111YE1D003312; Comments: #17590/SIS1/HB TO PS ; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2011

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2011

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2011

DocketSummons Issued; hb to ps; Party: Defendant Ward, Georffrey T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less