This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/24/2022 at 05:32:00 (UTC).

Catherine Popkin, et al Plaintiff vs. Otis Elevator Company, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 Catherine Popkin, Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against Otis Elevator Company, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is McCarthy, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7771

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

McCarthy, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Popkin, Catherine

Sands, James

Defendants

Otis Elevator Company

Point of Americas Phase I, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gdanski, Jonathan

1212 Se 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316-0000

Defendant Attorneys

Sacks, Robert E

Attorney at Shapiro, Blasi, Wasserman & Hermann, P.A.

7777 Glades Road, Suite 400

Boca Raton, FL 33434

Greenburg, Haldon Louis

Attorney at Tyson & Mendes

8201 Peters Rd Ste 1000

Plantation, FL 33324-3266

 

Court Documents

eSummons Issuance

5/26/2022 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/26/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

5/26/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

5/26/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

5/27/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

Notice of Appearance

6/7/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance

6/16/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Request for Production

6/22/2022 - Request for Production

Notice of Service of Interrogs

6/22/2022 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Notice of Service of Interrogs

6/22/2022 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request to Produce

6/22/2022 - Request to Produce

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES; Party: Defendant Otis Elevator Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Point of Americas Phase I, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketPer AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $100,001.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; POINT OF AMERICAS PHASE I, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Point of Americas Phase 1 Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greenburg, Haldon L, ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sacks, Robert Eric