This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/05/2020 at 01:29:27 (UTC).

KRG Miramar Square LLC Plaintiff vs. Marty Kiar, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 KRG Miramar Square LLC Plaintiff filed a Tax - Other Tax lawsuit against Marty Kiar, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5777

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Other Tax

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRG Miramar Square LLC

Defendants

Biegalski, Leon M

Kennedy, Thomas

Kiar, Marty

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Dennis, Timothy E, ESQ.

Teitler, Robert Lon

Sherman, Richard A

Schwartzreich, Mila K

 

Court Documents

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

10/31/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

10/31/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

10/31/2018 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

10/31/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Petition (eFiled)

10/31/2018 - Petition (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

10/31/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Notice

11/9/2018 - Notice

Motion to Dismiss

12/7/2018 - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Appearance

12/7/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Answer to Complaint

12/14/2018 - Answer to Complaint

Answer

12/20/2018 - Answer

Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

5/14/2019 - Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel

Order for Substitution of Counsel

5/15/2019 - Order for Substitution of Counsel

Notice of Appearance

6/6/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

4/20/2020 - Circuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCircuit - Notice LOP Order to Show Cause Notice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2019
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2019
View Court Documents

DocketOrder for Substitution of Counsel; Marty Kiar

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/14/2019
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation for Substitution of Counsel; MILA K. SCHWARTZREICH, ESQ FBN 85634; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer; Party: Defendant Kennedy, Thomas

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2018
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer to Complaint; Party: Defendant Biegalski, Leon M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2018
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Dismiss; Party: Defendant Kiar, Marty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Party: Defendant Biegalski, Leon M

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2018

DocketFiling Fee; Payor: TRACY L LITWINCZUK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A148135; Amount: $401.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2018

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: TRACY L LITWINCZUK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A148135; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2018

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: TRACY L LITWINCZUK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A148135; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2018

DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: TRACY L LITWINCZUK ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A148135; Amount: $10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2018
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2018
View Court Documents

DocketPetition (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff KRG Miramar Square LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2018
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; LEON M. BIEGALSKI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2018
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; THOMAS KENNEDY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2018
View Court Documents

DocketeSummons Issuance; MARTY KIAR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2018
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

[+] Read More [-] Read Less