This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 10/18/2023 at 02:36:17 (UTC).

The Kidwell Group LLC Plaintiff vs. Peoples Trust Insurance Company Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/22/2023 The Kidwell Group LLC Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Peoples Trust Insurance Company Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evans, Kal. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2740

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evans, Kal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Kidwell Group LLC

Vu, Kurt

Air Quality Assessors of Florida

Defendant

Peoples Trust Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kennon, Hans

Defendant Attorney

Corey, Michael David

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

8/22/2023 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

8/22/2023 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Request for Admissions

8/22/2023 - Request for Admissions

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

8/22/2023 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

8/22/2023 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

8/22/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

9/13/2023 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Appearance

9/22/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Summons Returned Served

9/27/2023 - Summons Returned Served

Motion to Appear Telephonically

9/28/2023 - Motion to Appear Telephonically

Motion for Extension of Time

10/12/2023 - Motion for Extension of Time

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

10/16/2023 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

 

Docket Entries

10/16/2023

HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 82 Evans, Kal; Location: West Courtroom 260

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023

DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference; Additional Text; DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion for Extension of Time; Additional Text; DEFENDANT S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Peoples Trust Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion to Appear Telephonically; Additional Text; OR VIRTUAL HEARING FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 16 2023 AT 10: 00AM; Party: Plaintiff The Kidwell Group LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Summons Returned Served; Additional Text; 09-21-2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant Peoples Trust Insurance Company

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Statement of Claim (eFiled)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request for Admissions

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Interrogs

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Request to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less