This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/26/2023 at 17:26:20 (UTC).

AmGuard Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Guard Insurance Group, Inc. Plaintiff vs. Air Pros, LLC Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/10/2023 AmGuard Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Guard Insurance Group, Inc Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Air Pros, LLC Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haimes, David A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3498

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haimes, David A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AmGuard Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Guard Insurance Group, Inc.

Defendants

Air Pros, LLC

Personalized Power and Air

Personalized Power Systems

Solar Bear Air Conditioning

Universal Air and Heat

Universal Restoration, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Batta, Ravi, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

5/10/2023 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

5/10/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

5/11/2023 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

eSummons Issuance

5/11/2023 - eSummons Issuance

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

5/15/2023 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; None

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; ISSUED ON: Air Pros, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $100,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff AmGuard Insurance Company, a subsidiary of Guard Insurance Group, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less