This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/15/2023 at 17:08:14 (UTC).

Monique Parker Plaintiff vs. JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS INC, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/17/2023 Monique Parker Plaintiff filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS INC, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Haury, William W., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1979

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Haury, William W., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parker, Monique

Defendants

JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS INC

GREENWICH BIOSCIENCES LLC

GREENWICH BIOSCIENCES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shavitz, Gregg I

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

3/17/2023 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

3/17/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

Exhibits

3/29/2023 - Exhibits

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

3/30/2023 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

Notice of Appearance

4/18/2023 - Notice of Appearance

Exhibits

4/19/2023 - Exhibits

Exhibits

4/19/2023 - Exhibits

Exhibits

4/19/2023 - Exhibits

Motion for Approval

4/19/2023 - Motion for Approval

 

Docket Entries

04/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Motion for Approval; Additional Text; UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF COLLECTIVE ACTION AND AUTHORIZING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND OPPORTUNITY TO FILE CONSENT TO JOIN AND RELEASE FORMS. AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; Party: Plaintiff Parker, Monique

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Exhibits

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Exhibits

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Exhibits

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS INC Defendant GREENWICH BIOSCIENCES LLC Defendant GREENWICH BIOSCIENCES INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; NONE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Exhibits; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Parker, Monique

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023

DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $100,001.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less