This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 05/29/2023 at 13:22:06 (UTC).

INVESTMENTS LIMITED Plaintiff vs. PATRICK HOVSEPIAN, etal

Case Summary

On 05/24/2023 INVESTMENTS LIMITED Plaintiff filed an Other lawsuit against PATRICK HOVSEPIAN, etal. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, Broward County North Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Hurley, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4441

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Hurley, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENTS LIMITED

Defendants

HOVSEPIAN, PATRICK

HOVSEPIAN, ARMANI HERMINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lazar, Jason M, ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Complaint (eFiled)

5/24/2023 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

5/24/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

eSummons Issuance

5/25/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/25/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/25/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/25/2023 - eSummons Issuance

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; 5 DAYS; Party: Defendant HOVSEPIAN, ARMANI HERMINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; 5 DAYS; Party: Defendant HOVSEPIAN, PATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; 20 DAYS; Party: Defendant HOVSEPIAN, ARMANI HERMINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; 20 DAYS; Party: Defendant HOVSEPIAN, PATRICK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less