This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 09/12/2023 at 06:25:10 (UTC).

Barbara A Day Plaintiff vs. AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 Barbara A Day Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Bidwill, Martin J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3092

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Bidwill, Martin J.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Day, Barbara A

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

ALBANY INTERNATIONAL, CORP

AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.

ASTENJOHNSON, INC.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BW/IP, INC.

CHICAGO BRIDGE & IRON COMPANY

CARRIER CORPORATION

CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC.

CRANE CO.

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

DCO, LLC

ELLIOTT COMPANY

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE US, INC.

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

FLUOR CORPORATION

58 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Briscoe, Edward J, ESQ.

Medina, Eduardo J, ESQ.

Horn, Hanson D

Ferguson, Timothy J

McCutcheon, Caitlyn R., ESQ.

Lopez, Frances

Reddin, John

Other Attorneys

Crump, Richard M

Smith, M Stephen

Edward, J Briscoe

COLLINGS, CHRISTOPHER J.M.

Mason, W

Galardi, Dino G

Melaragno, Peter J

Passaro, Geralyn Marie

Cunningham, Troy Patrick

Iovino, Caroline Marie

Sturge, Clarke S, ESQ.

Marston, David Weese, Jr.

Salas, Henry

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint

8/31/2023 - Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint

Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint

8/31/2023 - Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint

Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint

8/31/2023 - Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint

Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint

8/31/2023 - Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

8/31/2023 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer to Complaint

8/31/2023 - Answer to Complaint

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

8/31/2023 - Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer to Amended Complaint

9/1/2023 - Answer to Amended Complaint

Answer to Amended Complaint

9/1/2023 - Answer to Amended Complaint

eSummons Issuance

5/3/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/3/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/3/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/3/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/3/2023 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

5/3/2023 - eSummons Issuance

Amended Complaint

5/2/2023 - Amended Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

4/28/2023 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

4/28/2023 - Complaint (eFiled)

248 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint; Additional Text; DEFENDANT ELLIOTT COMPANY'S ANSWER AND OTHER DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint; Additional Text; DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS LLC'S ANSWER AND OTHER DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint; Additional Text; DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC'S ANSWER AND OTHER DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint; Additional Text; DEFENDANT ITT LLC'S ANSWER AND OTHER DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Additional Text; JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING LLC's ANSWER AND AFFIRMTIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Complaint; Additional Text; Party: Defendant GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, INC.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Additional Text; GARDNER DENVER, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMTIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Additional Text; SCAPA WAYCROSS, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
240 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant PARAMOUNT GLOBAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant PHARMACIA, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant PNEUMO ABEX LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant PREMIX-MARBLETITE MANUFACTURING CO.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant REDCO CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant RIC-WIL, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant RILEY POWER, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint; Additional Text; AND JURY DEMAND; Party: Plaintiff Day, Barbara A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $100,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less