This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 10/05/2020 at 13:44:31 (UTC).

Carolina Martins Plaintiff vs. B&L Services Inc, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 Carolina Martins Plaintiff filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against B L Services Inc, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Singer, Michele Towbin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6303

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Singer, Michele Towbin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martins, Carolina

Defendants

Joselus, Michaud

B&L Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Levine, Glen B., ESQ.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ANIDJAR & LEVINE, P.A

300 Se 17St

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant Attorney

Wadsworth, Christopher Wayne

Attorney at WADSWORTH, MARGREY & DIXON, LLP

261 Ne 1St Street, 5Th Floor

Miami, FL 33132

 

Court Documents

Order Taxing Costs

8/2/2018 - Order Taxing Costs

Notice of Hearing

6/27/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Motion to Tax Costs

6/27/2018 - Motion to Tax Costs

Motion

6/27/2018 - Motion

Motion for Sanctions

6/20/2018 - Motion for Sanctions

Order Granting Motion to Compel

5/23/2018 - Order Granting Motion to Compel

Order on Motion to Compel

5/15/2018 - Order on Motion to Compel

Order on Motion to Compel

5/15/2018 - Order on Motion to Compel

Order Setting Case Management Conference

5/15/2018 - Order Setting Case Management Conference

Notice of Hearing

5/4/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

5/4/2018 - Notice of Hearing

Certificate of No Objection

4/24/2018 - Certificate of No Objection

Notice of Cancellation

4/17/2018 - Notice of Cancellation

Order to Withdraw As Counsel

4/11/2018 - Order to Withdraw As Counsel

Motion to Compel

4/6/2018 - Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

4/3/2018 - Motion to Compel

Notice of Production From Non-Party

4/3/2018 - Notice of Production From Non-Party

Motion to Withdraw

4/2/2018 - Motion to Withdraw

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder; Comment (ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO FEES AND COSTS .PURSUANT TO PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT. TO PLAINTIFF ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115250960

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Taxing Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Party: Defendant B&L Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; FOR ENTITLEMENT TO FEES; Party: Defendant B&L Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder of Dismissal; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115167777

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DispositionDismissed After Hearing - Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Sanctions; Party: Defendant B&L Services Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion to Compel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Motion to Compel; Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogs; TO DEFENDANT, MICHAUD JOSELUS; Party: Plaintiff Martins, Carolina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions; TO DEFENPANI,-MICHAUD JOSELUS; Party: Plaintiff Martins, Carolina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Production; TO DEFENDANT, MICHAUD JOSELUS; Party: Plaintiff Martins, Carolina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketFiling Fee; Payor: GLEN BARRY LEVINE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A123022; Amount: $401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: GLEN BARRY LEVINE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A123022; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: GLEN BARRY LEVINE ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20171FA1A123022; Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled); Party: Plaintiff Martins, Carolina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; B&L Service Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Michaud Joselus

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less