This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 05/26/2023 at 10:38:44 (UTC).

Carol Storms, et al Plaintiff vs. V & G VACATION CREATION LLC, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 Carol Storms, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against V G VACATION CREATION LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levenson, Jeffrey R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7125

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levenson, Jeffrey R.

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

V & G VACATION CREATION LLC

Storms, Carol

The Storms Family Land Trust

of the Storms Family Land Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strohsahl, John

Defendant Attorney

Acosta-Lopez, Nory Maria

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

5/20/2023 - Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogs

5/20/2023 - Notice of Service of Interrogs

Response to Request for Production

5/9/2023 - Response to Request for Production

Notice of Service

5/9/2023 - Notice of Service

Agreed Order Granting

5/8/2023 - Agreed Order Granting

Motion for Enlargement of Time

4/24/2023 - Motion for Enlargement of Time

Request for Production

3/23/2023 - Request for Production

Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

3/23/2023 - Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

2/21/2023 - Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline

Joint Stipulation

12/8/2022 - Joint Stipulation

Motion for Default Final Judgment

12/7/2022 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Affidavit of Service

12/6/2022 - Affidavit of Service

Notice of Appearance

12/6/2022 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Extension of Time

12/6/2022 - Motion for Extension of Time

Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

11/18/2022 - Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC

eSummons Issuance

11/18/2022 - eSummons Issuance

Civil Cover Sheet

11/17/2022 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

11/17/2022 - Complaint (eFiled)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service of Interrogs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Response to Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Agreed Order Granting; Additional Text; Plaintiffs Motion for Enlargement of Time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Enlargement of Time; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Storms, Carol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request for Production

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Propounding Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline; Additional Text; CALENDAR CALL: 11-17-2023 at 9

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer to Counterclaim; Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff V & G Vacation Creation Llc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Joint Stipulation; Additional Text; STIPULATION FOR AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION; Party: Plaintiff Storms, Carol Defendant V & G VACATION CREATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Default Final Judgment; Additional Text; OF POSSESION, AND A WRIT OF POSSESSION; Party: Plaintiff Storms, Carol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit of Service; Additional Text; 11-19-2022 AT 11: 00A.M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Appearance; Additional Text; Party: Defendant V & G VACATION CREATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Motion for Extension of Time; Additional Text; MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING; Party: Defendant V & G VACATION CREATION LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's Certificate of Compliance W-2020-73CIV/2020-74-UFC; Additional Text; NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: eSummons Issuance; Additional Text; V& G VACATION CREATION, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Cover Sheet; Additional Text; Amount: $50,001.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (eFiled); Additional Text; Party: Plaintiff Storms, Carol

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less