This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 01/16/2022 at 15:30:32 (UTC).

Capital One Bank USA NA Plaintiff vs. William Lashbrook Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 Capital One Bank USA NA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against William Lashbrook Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Powell, Jackie. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8834

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Powell, Jackie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank USA NA

Defendant

Lashbrook, William

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eikner, Claudia R

P.O. Box 47718

Jacksonville, FL 32247

Defendant Attorney

Saul, Steven

Attorney at Eggnatz Pascucci

7450 Griffin Rd, Ste 230

Davie, FL 33314

 

Court Documents

Order Approving Settlement

12/7/2021 - Order Approving Settlement

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

10/11/2021 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

10/11/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

10/11/2021 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

10/11/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

Answer & Demand for Jury Trial

10/28/2021 - Answer & Demand for Jury Trial

Answer & Demand for Jury Trial

10/28/2021 - Answer & Demand for Jury Trial

Summons Served - Substitute Service

11/26/2021 - Summons Served - Substitute Service

Stipulation for-of Settlement

12/6/2021 - Stipulation for-of Settlement

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2022
  • HearingCredit Card - Pretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 47 Powell, Jackie; Location: Courtroom WW5150; CANCELED: Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DispositionDismissed, Settled or Disposed Before Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionOrder Approving Settlement; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 117790381

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation for-of Settlement; $2720.13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served - Substitute Service; 11/11/2021 Dru Lashbrook (FATHER; Party: Defendant Lashbrook, William

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Demand for Jury Trial; DEFENDANT'S CORRECTED; Party: Defendant Lashbrook, William

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Demand for Jury Trial; AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND; Party: Defendant Lashbrook, William

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less