This case was last updated from Broward County Circuit Courts on 06/25/2021 at 14:11:16 (UTC).

Capital One Bank USA NA Plaintiff vs. Rohan Williams Defendant

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Capital One Bank USA NA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rohan Williams Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Circuit Courts, Broward County Central Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Powell, Jackie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3140

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Broward County Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Powell, Jackie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank USA NA

Defendant

Williams, Rohan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alvarez, Melissa

Attorney at Attn: Cooling & Winter, LLC

7901 Sw 6Th Ct, Ste 310

Plantation, FL 33324

Defendant Attorney

Wells, Marilyn Gantt

Attorney at The Law Office of Marilyn G. Wells, PLLC

2064 Park St

Jacksonville, FL 32204

 

Court Documents

Summons Returned Served

6/21/2021 - Summons Returned Served

Notice of Appearance

6/21/2021 - Notice of Appearance

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

6/10/2021 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

6/10/2021 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

6/10/2021 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

6/10/2021 - Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • HearingCredit Card - Pretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 47 Powell, Jackie; Location: https://17thflcourts.zoom.us/j/95687147196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; 6/19/2021 12:49 PM; Party: Defendant Williams, Rohan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE; Party: Defendant Williams, Rohan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Amount: $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLS , MARILYN G