This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 01:42:52 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA) NA Plaintiff vs. Jgal Tahor Defendant

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 Capital One Bank USA NA Plaintiff filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jgal Tahor Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Francois, Phoebee. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2259

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Francois, Phoebee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA) NA

Defendant

Tahor, Jgal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Spinozza, Kevin

806 Douglas Rd, Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-3189

Lavrar, Flynn

Attorney at RAS LaVrar LLC

Po Box 19039

Plantation, FL 33317

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appearance

11/28/2019 - Notice of Appearance

Motion for Default Final Judgment

5/15/2018 - Motion for Default Final Judgment

Certificate

5/15/2018 - Certificate

Non-Military Affidavit

5/15/2018 - Non-Military Affidavit

Notice of Filing

5/15/2018 - Notice of Filing

Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

3/23/2018 - Disposition Order on Pretrial Conference

Summons Returned Served

3/20/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Statement of Claim (eFiled)

2/20/2018 - Statement of Claim (eFiled)

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

2/20/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice

2/20/2018 - Notice

eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

2/20/2018 - eSummons Issuance - Pretrial

Default Final Judgment

5/21/2018 - Default Final Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCertified Copy Fee; Payor: RAS LAVRAR LAW OFFICES ; Userid: CTS-phormell ; Receipt: 20183YF3M000169; Amount: $3.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketCert Copy Jgmt Issued; RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionDefault Final Judgment; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115087909

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Final Judgment; Party: Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; OF TAXABLE COSTS; Party: Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT; Party: Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA) NA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • HearingPretrial Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer(s): 81 Francois, Phoebee; Location: West Courtroom 240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisposition Order on Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; March 3, 2018; Party: Defendant Tahor, Jgal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A026700; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A026700; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance - Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less