This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 13:23:04 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. Plaintiff vs. Derek Martin Defendant

Case Summary

On 01/29/2018 Capital One Bank USA , N A Plaintiff filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Derek Martin Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Levine, Olga. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1622

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Broward County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Levine, Olga

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Defendant

Martin, Derek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lavrar, Flynn

Attorney at RAS LaVrar LLC

Po Box 19039

Plantation, FL 33317

Defendant Attorney

Giovachino, Louis

436 Sailboat Cir

Weston, FL 33326

 

Court Documents

Mediation Report

8/3/2018 - Mediation Report

Order Granting Motion

7/24/2018 - Order Granting Motion

Notice of Filing

7/19/2018 - Notice of Filing

Motion to Appear Telephonically

7/19/2018 - Motion to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Mediation

7/12/2018 - Notice of Mediation

Order Referring Case to Mediation

6/13/2018 - Order Referring Case to Mediation

Notice of Appearance

4/4/2018 - Notice of Appearance

Response

4/4/2018 - Response

Summons Returned Served

4/3/2018 - Summons Returned Served

Civil Cover Sheet

1/29/2018 - Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint (eFiled)

1/29/2018 - Complaint (eFiled)

Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

1/29/2018 - Notice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

1/29/2018 - Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

eSummons Issuance

1/29/2018 - eSummons Issuance

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

1/8/2019 - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

Jt Stip & Ord Approving Stip

8/7/2018 - Jt Stip & Ord Approving Stip

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice; Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115543138

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DispositionNotice of Voluntary Dismissal W/Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionJt Stip & Ord Approving Stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • DispositionDisposed by Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion; TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE OF REPRESENTATIVE AT MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Attached Billing Statements and Card Agreement; Party: Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appear Telephonically; Party: Plaintiff Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Mediation; Wednesday, August 1, 2018 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Referring Case to Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Party: Defendant Martin, Derek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse; TO COMPLAINT; Party: Defendant Martin, Derek

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; March 22, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A016247; Amount: $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: FLYNN LAVRAR ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20181FA1A016247; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information Within Court Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance

    Read MoreRead Less