This case was last updated from Broward County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 20:29:11 (UTC).

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services, et al Plaintiff vs. William Carey, et al Defendant

Case Summary

On 03/07/2019 Camelot Property Management Real Estate Services, Plaintiff filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against William Carey, Defendant. This case was filed in Broward County Courts, West Regional Courthouse located in Broward, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DePrimo, Natasha. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3974

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Courthouse:

    West Regional Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Broward, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DePrimo, Natasha

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services

Peoples Castles LLC

Defendants

Carey, William

Penha, Natasha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Worman, Robert M

1200 S Pine Island Road, Suite 220

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Served

4/24/2019 - Writ of Possession Returned Served

eWrit Issuance - Possession

3/26/2019 - eWrit Issuance - Possession

Summons Served-Posted

3/17/2019 - Summons Served-Posted

Summons Served-Posted

3/17/2019 - Summons Served-Posted

Motion for Default & Default

3/17/2019 - Motion for Default & Default

Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

3/17/2019 - Motion for Default Judgment of Eviction

Non-Military Affidavit

3/17/2019 - Non-Military Affidavit

Certificate of Mailing

3/11/2019 - Certificate of Mailing

eSummons Issuance

3/8/2019 - eSummons Issuance

eSummons Issuance

3/8/2019 - eSummons Issuance

Complaint (eFiled)

3/7/2019 - Complaint (eFiled)

Civil Cover Sheet

3/7/2019 - Civil Cover Sheet

Final Judgment for Eviction

3/22/2019 - Final Judgment for Eviction

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Served; 4/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeWrit Issuance - Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DispositionFinal Judgment for Eviction; Comment (COUNT I ); Vol./Book: 0; Page: 0; 1 Pages; Instrument Number: 115697149

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DispositionDisposed by Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketPleadings Sent Up To Judge; default final jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; March 9, 2019; Party: Defendant Carey, William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Served-Posted; March 9, 2019; Party: Defendant Penha, Natasha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default & Default; Defendant(s): WILLIAM CAREY, NATASHA PENHA (COUNT 1 ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment of Eviction; (COUNT I ONLY); Party: Plaintiff Peoples Castles LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNon-Military Affidavit; Defendant(s): WILLIAM CAREY, NATASHA PENHA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Carey, William

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketeSummons Issuance; Party: Defendant Penha, Natasha

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A035607; Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A035607; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued Fee; Payor: ROBERT WORMAN ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A035607; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (eFiled)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Camelot Property Management & Real Estate Services is a litigant